EP0137307 - Magnetic-recording supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1988 [1988/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heil, Guenter, Dr. Dirmsteiner Weg 41 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
Spoor, Herbert, Dr. Woogstrasse 44 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 03 /
Lenz, Werner, Dr. Heinrich-Baermann-Strasse 14 D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 04 /
Kovacs, Jenoe, Dr. Kantstrasse 9 D-6717 Hessheim / DE | 05 /
Grau, Werner, Dr. Tuchbleiche 5 D-6712 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 06 /
Balz, Werner, Dr. Kropsburgstrasse 44 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 07 /
Lehner, August Wachenheimer Strasse 4 D-6701 Roedersheim-Gronau / DE | [1985/16] | Application number, filing date | 84110584.4 | 06.09.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | DE19833332503 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3332503 | [1985/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0137307 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137307 | Date: | 12.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/702, C08F283/04, C08L75/04 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
G11B5/7026 (EP,US);
C08G18/672 (EP,US);
G11B5/7022 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10S428/928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31565 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/672, C08G18/6511 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/16] | Title | German: | Magnetische Aufzeichnungsträger | [1985/16] | English: | Magnetic-recording supports | [1985/28] | French: | Supports d'enregistrement magnétiques | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 25.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3029818 [ ] (SONY CORP); | DE2441148 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE2636425 [ ] (BASF AG); | DE3049034 [ ] (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]); | EP0021824 [ ] (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) |