EP0141957 - Plug for flat electrical cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quante Fernmeldetechnik GmbH Uellendahler Str. 353 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1986/05] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states Wilhelm Quante Spezialfabrik für Apparate der Fernmeldetechnik GmbH & Co. Uellendahler Strasse 353 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quante, Hermann Uellendahler Strasse 353 D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Ludewig, Karlheinrich, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig Postfach 20 14 62 42214 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Ludewig, Karlheinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. Buse Dipl.-Phys. Mentzel Dipl.-Ing. Ludewig, Postfach 20 14 62 D-42214 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110598.4 | 06.09.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | DE19833334615 | 24.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3334615 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141957 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141957 | Date: | 12.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141957 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/24, H01R23/66 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
H01R12/675 (EP);
H01R12/77 (EP);
H01R13/506 (EP);
H01R4/02 (EP);
H01R4/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Stecker für elektrische Flachkabel | [1985/21] | English: | Plug for flat electrical cables | [1985/21] | French: | Fiche pour câbles plats électriques | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 19.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2738869 (DUNKEL OTTO GMBH); | [A]US4148539 (HARDESTY EDWIN C); | [A]EP0014937 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE3020028 (STOCKO METALLWARENFAB HENKELS [DE]); | [E]DE3318966 (AMP INC [US]); | [E]DE8424021U ; | [E]DE8310859U ; | [E]DE3339313 (GROTE & HARTMANN [DE]) |