EP0137316 - Fuel-injection pump for internal-combustion engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1989 [1989/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konrath, Karl Schäferstrasse 41 D-7140 Ludwigsburg / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Otmar Böblinger Strasse 296 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1985/16] | Application number, filing date | 84110660.2 | 07.09.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | DE19833336870 | 11.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3336870 | [1985/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0137316 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137316 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F02D1/16, F02M41/12 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
F02M41/128 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/16] | F02D1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/16] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzpumpe für Brennkraftmaschinen | [1985/16] | English: | Fuel-injection pump for internal-combustion engines | [1985/31] | French: | Pompe d'injection de combustible pour moteurs à combustion interne | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 07.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/16] | 14.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2729807 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]DE3208633 (DIESEL KIKI CO [JP]) |