EP0141173 - Dispersible Berlin blue pigment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1988 [1988/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 253 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states MERCK PATENT GmbH Postfach, Frankfurter Strasse 250 D-64271 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rau, Axel, Dr. Hans-Thoma-Strasse 8 D-7798 Pfullendorf / DE | 02 /
Franz, Klaus-Dieter, Dr. Insterburgerstrasse 12 D-6233 Kelkheim / DE | [1985/20] | Application number, filing date | 84110723.8 | 08.09.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | DE19833334596 | 24.09.1983 Original published format: DE 3334596 | [1985/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0141173 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141173 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
C09C1/26 (EP,US);
C09C3/12 (KR);
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C01P2006/22 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,US);
C09C2200/401 (EP,US);
C09C2200/403 (EP,US);
C09C2200/407 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/20] | Title | German: | Dispergierbares Berliner Blau-Pigment | [1985/20] | English: | Dispersible Berlin blue pigment | [1985/20] | French: | Pigment au bleu de Prusse dispersable | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/48] | 10.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1270320 (ICI LTD); | [A]FR2291258 (ICI LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2070636 (MEARL CORP) |