Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0137335
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
07.07.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
27.02.1989 |
Withdrawal of application |
published on 19.04.1989 [1989/16] |
23.07.1987 |
First examination report |
|
17.02.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.04.1987 [1987/15] |
04.02.1987 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.03.1987 [1987/13] |
06.05.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.06.1986 [1986/26] |
20.01.1986 |
Publication of search report |
published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |
14.05.1985 |
Change - German title |
published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] |
14.05.1985 |
Change - French title |
published on 17.07.1985 [1985/29] |
16.02.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.04.1985 [1985/16] |