EP0137335 - Subsea casing hanger suspension system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.1989 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states FMC CORPORATION 200 East Randolph Drive Chicago Illinois 60601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennings, Charles Edward 9606 Railton Street Houston Texas 77080 / US | 02 /
Hopkins, Bob Clayton 18630 Prince William Lane Houston Texas 77058 / US | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/13] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/16] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle-Pagenberg-Dost-Altenburg & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110866.5 | 12.09.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | US19830535470 | 26.09.1983 Original published format: US 535470 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0137335 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0137335 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/043 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
E21B33/043 (EP,US);
E21B2200/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/16] | Title | German: | Verrohrungshänger für einen Unterwasserbohrlochkopf | [1985/29] | English: | Subsea casing hanger suspension system | [1985/16] | French: | Dispositif de suspension de tubage pour tête de puits immergée | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 17.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/26] | 27.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 21.02.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1988 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3090438 (MAX RAULINS GEORGE); | [A]US3248132 (PIERCE JR ELWOOD K); | [A]US3299951 (TODD WILLIAM L); | [Y]US3457992 (BROWN CICERO C); | [YP]GB2127458 (NAT SUPPLY CO) |