EP0140110 - Process for working-up full animal blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1988 [1988/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akademia Rolnicza ul. Norwida 25 Wroclaw / PL | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaleski, Stanislaw Wroclaw ul Canaletta 16/5 / PL | 02 /
Tereszkiewicz, Ryszard Wroclaw ul Wróblewskiego 25 / PL | 03 /
Lawik, Bogumil Wroclaw ul Canaletta 2a/5 / PL | 04 /
Kierzkowski, Marian Wroclaw ul Zachodnia 4/8 / PL | [1985/41] |
Former [1985/19] | 01 /
Zaleski, Stanislaw Wroclaw ul Canaletta 16/5 / PL | ||
02 /
Tereskiewicz, Ryszard Wroclaw ul Wróblewskiego 25 / PL | |||
03 /
Lawik, Bogumil Wroclaw ul Canaletta 2a/5 / PL | |||
04 /
Kierzkowski, Marian Wroclaw ul Zachodnia 4/8 / PL | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84110999.4 | 14.09.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | PL19940002443 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: PL 244394 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140110 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140110 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140110 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A23J3/00, A23L1/30, A23K1/04, // A61K35/14, A61K7/00, A01N1/02 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
A61K35/14 (EP);
A23J3/12 (EP);
A23K10/24 (EP);
A61K8/983 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung von Tiervollblut | [1985/19] | English: | Process for working-up full animal blood | [1985/19] | French: | Procédé de traitement de sang d'animaux entier | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 21.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]HU24071 ; | [A]FR2467550 ; | [A]DE114823 ; | [AP]WO8400098 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 15, Oktober 1978, Seite 462, Nr. 127880e, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.I. ZHARINOV et al.: "Use of precipitated blood plasma proteins in the production of canned meat paste products" & MYASN. IND. SSSR 1978, (6), 35-8 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 99, Nr. 1, Juli 1983, Seite 413, Nr. 4397b, Columbus, Ohio, US; & HU - A - 24 071 (A. GARDIAN et al.) 28.12.1982, & HU24071 A 00000000 |