blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0137371

EP0137371 - Process for the racemisation of optically active aminoacids [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.1990
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.05.1990 [1990/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/16]For all designated states
HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grabley, Susanne, Dr.
Hölderlinstrasse 7
D-6240 Königstein/Taunus / DE
[1985/16]
Application number, filing date84111206.320.09.1984
[1985/16]
Priority number, dateDE1983333484927.09.1983         Original published format: DE 3334849
[1985/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0137371
Date:17.04.1985
Language:DE
[1985/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0137371
Date:27.12.1985
Language:DE
[1985/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0137371
Date:31.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.10.1985
ClassificationIPC:C07B55/00
[1985/16]
CPC:
C07F9/301 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1985/16]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Racemisierung optisch aktiver Aminosäuren[1985/16]
English:Process for the racemisation of optically active aminoacids[1985/29]
French:Procédé de racémisation d'acides aminés optiquement actifs[1985/29]
Examination procedure10.03.1986Examination requested  [1986/19]
10.08.1987Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.12.1987Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
31.03.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.1989Fee for grant paid
07.02.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.03.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1543919  (TOA GOSEI CHEM IND);
 [A]DE1964420  (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE);
 [AD]DE2352579  (AJINOMOTO KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.