EP0141980 - Counter flow washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.08.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senkingwerk GmbH Senkingstrasse 1-3 D-31137 Hildesheim / DE | [1986/46] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states Senkingwerk GmbH & Co. Senkingstrasse 1-3 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stoll, Karl-Heinz Alexander Richard-Wagner-Strasse 38 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | ||
Former [1991/05] | Grosse, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Herrmann-Trentepohl, Kirschner Grosse, Bockhorni & Partner Forstenrieder Allee 59 D-81476 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111330.1 | 22.09.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | DE19833341504 | 17.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3341504 | [1985/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141980 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141980 | Date: | 26.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141980 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D06F31/00 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
D06F31/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/21] | Title | German: | Gegenstrom - Taktwaschmaschine | [1985/21] | English: | Counter flow washing machine | [1985/21] | French: | Machine à laver à contre-courant | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 05.06.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Transferon Wäschereimaschinen GmbH Lugwaldstrasse 17-19 D-75417 Mühlacker / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Reinhard Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | 02
15.12.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE LAVATEC Wäschereimaschinen GmbH DE-6927 Bad Rappenau / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Hans Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Transferon Wäschereimaschinen GmbH Lugwaldstrasse 17-19 D-75417 Mühlacker / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Reinhard Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
15.12.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE LAVATEC Wäschereimaschinen GmbH DE-6927 Bad Rappenau / DE Opponent's representative Müller, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 D-74074 Heilbronn / DE | |||
Former [1989/06] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.1988
13.01.1989
ADMISSIBLE Transferon Wäschereimaschinen GmbH Lugwaldstrasse 17-19 D-75417 Mühlacker / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag, Reinhard Patentanwälte Dr. Ulrich Ostertag Dr. Reinhard Ostertag Eibenweg 10 D-70597 Stuttgart / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 18.01.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.05.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 18.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.08.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 16.06.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/39] | 16.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 23.09.1991 | Appeal received No. T0730/91 | 11.12.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.08.1993 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M08) [1993/31] | 22.03.1994 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/13] | 16.06.1994 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 16.06.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.1994 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.1989 | NL | 01.04.1990 | GB | 22.09.1993 | [2015/21] |
Former [1995/03] | CH | 16.03.1988 | |
LI | 16.03.1988 | ||
AT | 22.09.1989 | ||
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
GB | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 22.09.1989 | |
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
GB | 22.09.1993 | ||
Former [1990/52] | AT | 22.09.1989 | |
NL | 01.04.1990 | ||
Former [1990/43] | NL | 01.04.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | DE1267655 [ ] (POENSGEN GEBR GMBH); | DE2900467 [ ] (POENSGEN & SULZMANN GMBH GEB); | DE3040377 [ ] (TEXTIMA VEB K [DD]); | EP0063476 [ ] (PELLERIN CORP MILNOR [US]) | Examination | DE2949228 |