EP0138113 - Process for the preparation of optically uniform azetidinones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Gérard, Dr. Mittler Feldweg 6 CH-4468 Kienberg / CH | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Martin, Björn, et al Grenzacherstrasse 124 Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | [1985/17] | Application number, filing date | 84111448.1 | 26.09.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | CH19830005365 | 03.10.1983 Original published format: CH 536583 | [1985/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0138113 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138113 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D205/08, C07D405/04 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP);
C07D205/08 (KR);
C07D205/085 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von optisch einheitlichen Azetidinonen | [1985/17] | English: | Process for the preparation of optically uniform azetidinones | [1985/24] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'azétidinones optiquement uniformes | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/17] | 07.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.09.1988 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | EP0073061 [ ] (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) |