EP0176607 - Electrical connection device at the end of a winding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.1989 [1989/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohloff, Rolf Flürleinstrasse 16 D-8700 Würzburg 25 / DE | [1986/15] | Application number, filing date | 84111572.8 | 27.09.1984 | [1986/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0176607 | Date: | 09.04.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0176607 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01F5/04, H01R4/24 | [1986/15] | CPC: |
H01F5/04 (EP,US);
H01R4/2416 (EP);
H01R4/14 (EP);
H01R9/15 (EP);
H01R9/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/15] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsvorrichtung am Ende einer Wicklung | [1986/15] | English: | Electrical connection device at the end of a winding | [1986/15] | French: | Dispositif de liaison électrique au bout d'un bobinage | [1986/15] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/28] | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3979615 (NEFF NELSON EDWARD) | [A] - NEWS ELECTRONICS, Band 15, Nr. 2, Januar 1982, Seiten 81-83, London, GB; C. KINDELL: "Coil winding termination" |