EP0146698 - Test and maintenance system for a data processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | For all designated states Bull HN Information Systems Inc. Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street Wilmington Delaware / US | ||
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states Honeywell Information Systems Inc. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Homer W. 6904 West Corrine Drive Peoria Arizona 85345 / US | 02 /
King, James L. 1251 West Rancho Drive Phoenix Arizona 85013 / US | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Falcetti, Carlo Bull HN Information Systems Italia S.p.A. Direzione Brevetti I-20010 Pregnana Milanese (Milano) / IT | [1989/24] |
Former [1985/27] | Falcetti, Carlo Servizio Brevetti Honeywell I.S.I. I-20010 Pregnana Milanese / IT | Application number, filing date | 84111613.0 | 28.09.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | US19830539357 | 06.10.1983 Original published format: US 539357 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146698 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146698 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
G06F11/27 (EP,US);
G06F11/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | Prüf- und Wartungssystem für ein Datenverarbeitungssystem | [1985/31] | English: | Test and maintenance system for a data processing system | [1985/27] | French: | Système de test et de maintenance pour un système de traitement de données | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/36] | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4298980 (HAJDU JOHANN, et al) | [X] - DIGEST OF PAPERS OF THE 1979 IEEE TEST CONFERENCE, Cherry-Hill, New Jersey, 23rd-25th October 1979, pages 29-36, IEEE, New York, US; L.A. STOLTE et al.: "Design for testability of the IBM system/38" | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE, vol. 36, 1982, pages 346-350, Oak Brook, Illinois, US; S. AL-HARIRI et al.: "An easily testable structure for LSI and VLSI circuits" |