EP0141280 - Apparatus for manufacturing slide fasteners with flies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yunoki, Akio 358, No-machi Namerikawa-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 02 /
Osaki, Tatsuo 2945, Kichijima Uozu-shi Toyama-ken / JP | 03 /
Fuda, Masaaki 212-6, Tachimachi Mizuhashi Toyama-shi Toyama-ken / JP | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/20] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111829.2 | 03.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | JP19830188753 | 07.10.1983 Original published format: JP 18875383 | JP19830194496 | 18.10.1983 Original published format: JP 19449683 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141280 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141280 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141280 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A44B19/60, A44B19/62, A44B19/42 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
A44B19/60 (EP);
A44B19/00 (KR);
A41H37/06 (EP);
A44B19/42 (EP);
A44B19/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Reissverschlüssen mit Deckbändern | [1988/27] | English: | Apparatus for manufacturing slide fasteners with flies | [1985/20] | French: | Appareil pour fabriquer des fermetures à glissière munies de pattes pour braguettes | [1985/20] |
Former [1985/20] | Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Reissverschlüssen mit Hosenklappern | Examination procedure | 22.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 13.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2021681 [ ] (TEXTRON INC); | US3570104 [ ] (JENSEN PHILIP BREHMER) |