EP0144607 - Carding plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Change - representative | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLINGSWORTH GMBH Rosenstrasse 5-7 D-75387 Neubulach / DE | [1989/21] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states Jacobson, Sven-Gunnar, Dipl.-Ing. Stöckenweidstrasse 25 CH-8731 Uetliburg / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacobson, Sven-Gunnar, Dipl.-Ing. Stöckenweidstrasse 25 CH-8731 Uetliburg / CH | [1989/21] |
Former [1985/25] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/21] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/25] | König, Oskar, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Klüpfelstrasse 6 Postfach 10 27 33 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 84111943.1 | 05.10.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833336601 | 07.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3336601 | DE19833336602 | 07.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3336602 | DE19830029023U | 07.10.1983 Original published format: DE 8329023 U | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0144607 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | D01G15/24, D01G15/88 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
D01G15/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1985/25] | Title | German: | Langgestreckte Kardierplatte | [1985/25] | English: | Carding plate | [1985/25] | French: | Plaque de cardage | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 07.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 12.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/39] | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/39] | Request for further processing for: | 25.09.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   06.12.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2100305 ; | [Y]DE52874 ; | [A]DE2226914 ; | [A]DE3211531 ; | [A]FR750191 |