EP0141311 - Negative working electron beam resist system to be dry-developed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaplan, Leon H. 1378 Edcris Road Yorktown Heights, N.Y. 10 598 / US | 02 /
Kaplan, Richard Dean 11F Canterbury Lane Wappingers Falls, N.Y. 12 590 / US | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112183.3 | 11.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | US19830545032 | 25.10.1983 Original published format: US 545032 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141311 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141311 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141311 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/038 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
G03F7/038 (EP,US);
G03F7/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/20] | G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/20] | Title | German: | Negativer Elektronenlack für Trockenentwicklung | [1985/30] | English: | Negative working electron beam resist system to be dry-developed | [1985/20] | French: | Réserve négative sensible aux électrons pour développement à sec | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 23.11.1984 | Examination requested [1985/20] | 30.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5746241 ; | [X]EP0005775 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]); | [Y]DE2726813 (MOTOROLA INC); | [Y]US4241165 (HUGHES HENRY G [US], et al); | [A]DE3235108 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4398001 (CHENG YING Y, et al) | [Y] - D.J. ELLIOTT: "Integrated circuit fabrication technology", 1982, pages 209-232, Mc-Graw-Hill, New York, US; Chapter 9 "Development" | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 25, no. 12, May 1983, page 6307, New York, US; H. HIRAOKA et al.: "Poly(olefin-sulfones)-novolacs as positive/negative tone deep UV-photo-resists" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 26, no. 1, June 1983, page 392, New York, US; H. HIRAOKA et al.: "Ortho-chlorinated novolacs as host resins for poly(olefin sulfones) in lithographic resist applications" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 121 (P-126)[999], 6th July 1982; & JP-A-57 46 241 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 16-03-1982, & JP5746241 A 00000000 | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 20, 14th May 1984, page 559, abstract no. 165352n, Columbus, Ohio, US; H. HIRAOKA et al.: "Deep UV photolithography with composite photoresists made of poly(olefin sulfones)", & ACS SYMP. SER. 1984, 242(Polym. Electron.), 55-64 |