EP0138198 - Isoindole diuretic derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 345 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10154 / US | ||
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Company 345 Park Avenue New York New York 10154 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolak, Terrence M. P.O. Box 464 Plainsboro, NJ 18536 / US | 02 /
Martin, Tellis A. 602 S.E. 1st Street Evansville, IN 47713 / US | [1991/01] |
Former [1985/17] | 01 /
Dolak, Terrence M. P.O. Box 464 Plainsboro New Jersey 18536 / US | ||
02 /
Martin, Tellis A. 602 S.E. 1st Street Evansville Indiana 47713 / US | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112220.3 | 11.10.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | US19830541400 | 13.10.1983 Original published format: US 541400 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138198 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138198 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0138198 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/46, C07D401/06, C07D413/06, A61K31/40 | [1985/17] | CPC: |
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
A61P7/10 (EP);
C07D209/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/17] | Title | German: | Diuretische-Isoindolen-Derivate | [1985/24] | English: | Isoindole diuretic derivatives | [1985/17] | French: | Dérivés diurétiques d'isoindoles | [1985/24] | Examination procedure | 25.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 27.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.02.1987 | 02.11.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB667457 (STERLING DRUG INC); | [Y]FR1264070 (KNOLL AG); | [A]US3445476 (SULKOWSKI THEODORE S, et al); | [A]DE1928474 (MILES LAB); | [A]FR2154520 (KABI AB); | [Y]GB1571742 (TEVA PHARMA) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 23, 6th December 1971, page 304, no. 140619g, Columbus, Ohio, US; NOUR EL-DIN et al.: "Synthesis of certain new derivatives related to the diuretic sulfonamides" & J. PHARM. SCI. 1970, 11(1), 37-44 | Examination | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 75, no. 23, 06 Dec 1971, Columbus, OH (US); NOUR EL-DIN et al.: "Synthesis of certain new derivatives related to the diuretic sulfonamides", p. 304, no. 140619g |