EP0143294 - Apparatus for dosing a component to a solvent or diluent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weber Apparatebau GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 27-31 D-3208 Giesen / DE | [1985/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Klaus Bischofskamp 35 D-3200 Hildesheim / DE | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | König, Norbert, et al Brümmerstedt Oelfke Seewald & König Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 10 26 30010 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | König, Norbert, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Leine & König Burckhardtstrasse 1 D-30163 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112286.4 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | DE19833339420 | 29.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3339420 | [1985/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143294 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143294 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143294 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/68, B01J4/02 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G05D11/132 (EP,US);
C02F1/686 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum dosierbaren Zugeben eines Stoffes zu einem Lösungs- oder Verdünnungsmittel | [1985/23] | English: | Apparatus for dosing a component to a solvent or diluent | [1985/28] | French: | Dispositif pour le dosage d'un composé à un solvant ou diluant | [1985/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 16.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/34] | 02.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1990
17.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.04.1990
17.05.1990
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 18.06.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.08.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.08.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.08.1989 | FR | 02.08.1989 | GB | 02.08.1989 | IT | 02.08.1989 | NL | 02.08.1989 | SE | 02.08.1989 | AT | 12.10.1989 | CH | 31.10.1989 | LI | 31.10.1989 | LU | 31.10.1989 | DE | 03.07.1990 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/52] | BE | 02.08.1989 | |
GB | 02.08.1989 | ||
IT | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
AT | 12.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
LU | 31.10.1989 | ||
DE | 03.07.1990 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 02.08.1989 | |
GB | 02.08.1989 | ||
IT | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
AT | 12.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
DE | 03.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | BE | 02.08.1989 | |
GB | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
AT | 12.10.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
DE | 03.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/25] | BE | 02.08.1989 | |
GB | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
DE | 03.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/12] | BE | 02.08.1989 | |
GB | 02.08.1989 | ||
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/45] | GB | 02.08.1989 | |
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
CH | 31.10.1989 | ||
LI | 31.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 02.08.1989 | |
NL | 02.08.1989 | ||
SE | 02.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | NL | 02.08.1989 | |
SE | 02.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH168356 (TIEFBOHR & BAUGESELLSCHAFT A G [CH]); | [X]US2064627 (PAINE LOUIS B); | [A]US2272721 (MCCOY VERL E); | [A]US3094135 (MARIE PONSAR YVES); | [A]CH479131 (TOBLER KURT DIPL ING CHEM [CH]); | [A]FR2109300 (SEPOC); | [A]US4094786 (BURY JOHN R) |