EP0143295 - Composites utilizing fillers of surface modified hollow microspheres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PQ Corporation Valley Forge Executive Mall P.O. Box 840 Valley Forge, PA 19482 / US | [1985/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Christopher G. 6334 East Valley Green Flourtown, PA 19031 / US | 02 /
Peters, John F. 606 Weikel Road Lansdale, PA 19446 / US | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/23] | Kraus, Walter, Dr. Patentanwälte Kraus Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112323.5 | 12.10.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | US19830546232 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: US 546232 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143295 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08K7/26, C03C11/00 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
C08K7/26 (EP,US);
C08J9/32 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1985/23] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen welche Füllstoffe aus oberflächenmodifizierten Mikrohohlkugeln enthalten | [1985/23] | English: | Composites utilizing fillers of surface modified hollow microspheres | [1985/23] | French: | Compositions contenant des charges à base de microsphères creuses modifiées à la surface | [1985/23] | File destroyed: | 24.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 02.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 03.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 07.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 03.03.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/39] | 03.04.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3794503 (NETTING D); | [AD]US4340642 (NETTING DAVID I, et al) |