EP0151692 - Push button operated excess current protective circuit breaker [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1989 [1989/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ellenberger & Poensgen GmbH Industriestrasse 2-8 D-90518 Altdorf / DE | [1985/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krasser, Fritz Heisterstrasse 3 D-8503 Altdorf / DE | [1985/34] | Representative(s) | Tergau, Enno, et al Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/34] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Tergau & Pohl Patentanwälte Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 D-90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112496.9 | 17.10.1984 | [1985/34] | Priority number, date | DE19833342144 | 22.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342144 | [1985/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0151692 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0151692 | Date: | 22.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151692 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/30 | [1985/34] | CPC: |
H01H73/303 (EP,US);
H01H2071/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/34] | Title | German: | Druckknopfbetätigter Überstromschutzschalter | [1985/34] | English: | Push button operated excess current protective circuit breaker | [1985/34] | French: | Disjoncteur de protection à courant excessif actionné par un bouton-poussoir | [1985/34] | Examination procedure | 13.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 17.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH397835 (ELLENBERGER & POENSGEN [DE]); | [Y]US3361888 (BRACKETT LAWRENCE W); | [Y]US4039992 (GIVLER OMAR R); | [A]DE2725263 (HEINEMANN ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]DE2917557 (HOFSASS P); | [A]FR2521775 (CODOGNESE MECCANOTEC [IT]) |