EP0144657 - Method for displaying text with different write directions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/25] | Method and apparatus for displaying text with different write directions | ||
[1988/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1989 [1989/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Günther, Gerd-Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Gailenreuther Strasse 19 D-8000 München 60 / DE | 02 /
Miller, Heide-Marie Vorhölzerstrasse 1 D-8000 München 71 / DE | 03 /
Rothenaicher, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing. Laimbichl 79 D-8334 Wurmannsquick / DE | [1985/25] | Application number, filing date | 84112600.6 | 18.10.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833338366 | 21.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3338366 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144657 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144657 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144657 | Date: | 03.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/00, G09G1/16, B41J3/00 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
G09G5/08 (EP);
G09G5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Darstellen von Schriften mit unterschiedlichen Schreibrichtungen an einer Anzeigeeinheit | [1988/05] | English: | Method for displaying text with different write directions | [1988/05] | French: | Méthode d'affichage de textes avec des directions d'écriture différentes | [1988/05] |
Former [1985/25] | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Darstellen von Schriften mit unterschiedlichen Schreibrichtungen an einer Anzeigeeinheit | ||
Former [1985/25] | Method and apparatus for displaying text with different write directions | ||
Former [1985/25] | Méthode et dispositif d'affichage de textes avec des directions d'écriture différentes | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 05.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 06.08.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2490365 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS FRANCE [FR]) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 22, Nr. 1, Juli 1979, Seiten 386-388, NEW YORK, (US). M.A. BATEY et al.: "Dual keying direction display closure". * Seiten 386-388 * |