EP0141377 - Metal complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-2, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Nobuo c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho Tokyo Bunshitsu 7-6, Kamiya 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kurahashi, Takeo c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho Tokyo Bunshitsu 7-6, Kamiya 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Motohashi, Katsuichi Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho Tokyo Bunshitsu 7-6, Kamiya 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sugiyama, Genpei c/o Hodogaya Chemical Co., Ltd. Chuo Kenkyusho Tokyo Bunshitsu 7-6, Kamiya 3-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112827.5 | 24.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | JP19830205879 | 04.11.1983 Original published format: JP 20587983 | JP19830205880 | 04.11.1983 Original published format: JP 20588083 | JP19830208256 | 08.11.1983 Original published format: JP 20825683 | JP19830208257 | 08.11.1983 Original published format: JP 20825783 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141377 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141377 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141377 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09B44/02, C09B45/14, G03G9/08 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
G03G9/091 (EP,US);
C09B44/02 (EP,US);
C09B45/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1985/20] | Title | German: | Metallkomplexe | [1985/30] | English: | Metal complexes | [1985/20] | French: | Complexes métalliques | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 06.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1211425 (SANDOZ SA); | [X]WO8103179 (SANDOZ AG [CH]); | [A]EP0059814 (HODOGAYA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) |