EP0140345 - Tyre valve dust cap with deflation indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elektron Styria Technische Serienprodukte Ges.m.b.H. Südliches Lazarettfeld 36 A-8020 Graz / AT | [1987/07] |
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states Achterholt, Rainer Paul-Zoll-Strasse 3 D-8963 Waltenhofen 1 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Achterholt, Rainer Paul-Zoll-Str. 3 D-8963 Waltenhofen 1 / DE | [1987/07] |
Former [1985/19] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Brehm, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Brehm, Hans-Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner GbR Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/31] | Brehm, Hans-Peter, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Tischer, Kern & Brehm Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-8000 München 70 / DE | ||
Former [1987/07] | Tischer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-8000 München 70 / DE | ||
Former [1985/19] | Brehm, Hans-Peter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte Kern, Brehm & Partner Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 73 D-81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112901.8 | 25.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19833339095 | 28.10.1983 Original published format: DE 3339095 | DE19843422725 | 19.06.1984 Original published format: DE 3422725 | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140345 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140345 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140345 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B60C29/00 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B60C23/0496 (EP,US);
G01L17/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3662 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8326 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Ventilkappe mit Druckminderungsanzeige für Luftreifen | [1985/19] | English: | Tyre valve dust cap with deflation indicator | [1985/19] | French: | Chapeau de valve pour pneumatiques avec indicateur d'abaissement de la pression interne | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 24.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB191027686 (FARIES ROBERT [US]); | [A]FR64792E |