EP0144694 - Method of making semi-finished products consisting of stainless austenitic or martensitic steel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.1988 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states BROWN, BOVERI & CIE Aktiengesellschaft Kallstadter Strasse 1 D-68309 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rydstad, Hans, Dr. Bollstr. 28 CH-5413 Birmenstorf / CH | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Lück, Gert Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht (TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I 5401 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Lück, Gert Asea Brown Boveri AG Immaterialgüterrecht (TEI) Haselstrasse 16/699 I 5401 Baden / CH | ||
Former [1985/25] | Lück, Gert, Dr. rer. nat. c/o ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG Patentabteilung CH-5401 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 84112965.3 | 27.10.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833339593 | 02.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3339593 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144694 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144694 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/02 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C21D11/00 (EP);
C21D8/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halbzeug aus einem rostfreien austenitischenoder martensitischen Stahl | [1985/25] | English: | Method of making semi-finished products consisting of stainless austenitic or martensitic steel | [1985/25] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de demi-produits en acier inoxydable austénitique ou martensitique | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 03.05.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/42] | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1988/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.04.1988 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4360391 ; | [Y]DE1752549 ; | [A]DE3200904 ; | [A]US3364713 ; | [A]DE1058528 ; | [A]EP0060577 ; | [A]JPS5741324 ; | [A]JPS5579826 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 144 (C-110)[992]25. Juni 1982; & JP - A - 57 41324 (HITACHI) 08.03.1982 | [A] - STAHL UND EISEN, Band 85, Nr. 22, 4. November 1965, Seiten 1452-1461D}sseldorf; A. RANDAK et al.: "W{rmebehandlung von Baust{hlen und nichtrostenden St{hlen aus der Walzhitze" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 4, Nr. 124 (C-23)[606]2. September 1980; & JP - A - 55 79826 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA JUKOGYO) 16.06.1980 |