EP0144702 - Process for preparing bifunctional polyphenylene ethers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heitz, Walter, Prof. Dr. Am Schmidtborn 5 D-3575 Kirchhain / DE | 02 /
Risse, Wilhelm Weidenhäuserstrasse 72 D-3550 Marburg / DE | [1985/25] | Application number, filing date | 84113001.6 | 29.10.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833340493 | 09.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3340493 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144702 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144702 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144702 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/38, C08G65/44, C08G81/00 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C08G65/44 (EP,US);
C08G65/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von bifunktionnellen Polyphenylenoxiden | [1985/25] | English: | Process for preparing bifunctional polyphenylene ethers | [1985/25] | French: | Procédé de préparation de poly(oxydes de phénylène) difonctionnels | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/25] | 08.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 29.10.1987 | Appeal received No. T0088/88 | 29.01.1988 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.07.1989 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU328130 ; | [Y]JP49069797 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 77, Nr. 4, 24. Juli 1972, Seite 27, Nr. 20346k, COLUMBUS, OHIO, (US); & SU-A-328 130 (INSTITUTE OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, ACADEMY OF SCIENCES) (02-02-1972), & SU328130 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 82, Nr. 4, 27. Januar 1975, Seite 52, Nr. 17798g, COLUMBUS, OHIO, (US); & JP-A-49 069 797 (ASAHI DOW Ltd.) (05-07-1974), & JP49069797 A 00000000 | by applicant | SU231814 | JPS4428511B | JPS4531311B | JPS4530355B | NL6413958 | US3219698 | US3236807 | US3257357 | NL6504925 | NL6610017 | US3306879 | US3313776 | US3342892 | FR1523821 | US3382212 | FR1544942 | US3432469 | DE2061116 | US3914266 | US3956442 | US3965069 | DE2822856 | - J.POLYMER SEI., (1962), vol. 61, page 135 | - J. POLYMER SCI., (1961), vol. 49, page 267 | - J. POLYMER SCI. A, (1965), vol. 3, page 2009 | - J. POLYMER SCI., (1966), vol. B4, page 436 | - J. POLYMER SCI., (1962), vol. 58, page 469 |