Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE26050T | 15.04.1987 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP84113025 | 29.10.1984 | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3462740D1 | 23.04.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 | DE3462740 | 29.10.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0146727 | Global Dossier | 18.03.1987 | B1 | EP0146727 | 03.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1265187 | 30.01.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3340573 | 15.05.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8507740 | 16.09.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3340573 | 09.11.1983 |