EP0146727 - Process for achieving the no-load state of an induction motor fed by a thyristor inverter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1988 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waidmann, Wilhelm Kunigundenstrasse 2 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Urbanke, Christian, Dr. Fröbelstrasse 25 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1985/27] | Application number, filing date | 84113025.5 | 29.10.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | DE19833340573 | 09.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3340573 | [1985/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0146727 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146727 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/515 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
H02M7/5152 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1985/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erreichen des Leerlaufzustandes einer mittels eines Thyristor-Wechselrichters gespeisten Asynchronmaschine | [1985/27] | English: | Process for achieving the no-load state of an induction motor fed by a thyristor inverter | [1985/27] | French: | Procédure pour atteindre l'état de marche à vide d'une machine asynchrone alimentée par un onduleur à thyristors | [1985/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 30.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4118770 (SUGIMOTO SACHIROU, et al); | [A]DE2952324 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [DE]) |