EP0142746 - Arrangement for controlling the gob distributor of a glass processing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/22] | Switching arrangement for controlling the gob distributor of a glass processing machine | ||
[1989/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMHART ZÜRICH S.A. Seefeldstrasse 224 Zürich / CH | [1987/42] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states RUHRGLAS Aktiengesellschaft Ruhrglasstrasse 50 D-4300 Essen 12 / DE | ||
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states VEBA-GLAS Aktiengesellschaft Ruhrglasstrasse 50 D-4300 Essen 12 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoth, Werner-Dieter Byfangerstrasse 175 D-4300 Essen 15 / DE | 02 /
Kopatz, Klaus Wrangelstrasse 30a D-4250 Bottrop / DE | 03 /
Hüllen, Helmut Dreilindenstrasse 93 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Drury, Peter Lawrence, et al T&N Limited, 5 Riverstone, Middlemarch Business Park,Siskin Drive Coventry CV3 4FJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Drury, Peter Lawrence, et al Emhart Patents Department Lyn House 39 The Parade Oadby, Leicester LE2 5BB / GB | ||
Former [1987/36] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1985/22] | Spalthoff, Adolf, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. A. Spalthoff, Dipl.-Ing. K. Lelgemann, Postfach 34 02 20 D-45074 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113049.5 | 30.10.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | DE19833342062 | 22.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342062 | [1985/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142746 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142746 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142746 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C03B9/40, C03B7/16 | [1986/22] | CPC: |
C03B7/16 (EP,US);
Y10S65/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/22] | C03B9/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Steuerung eines Tropfenverteilers einer Glas-Verarbeitungsmaschine | [1989/21] | English: | Arrangement for controlling the gob distributor of a glass processing machine | [1989/21] | French: | Arrangement pour la commande d'un distributeur de gouttes dans une machine à façonner le verre | [1989/21] |
Former [1985/22] | Schaltungsanordnung zur Steuerung eines Tropfenverteilers einer Glas-Verarbeitungsmaschine | ||
Former [1985/22] | Switching arrangement for controlling the gob distributor of a glass processing machine | ||
Former [1985/22] | Arrangement de couplage pour la commande d'un distributeur de gouttes dans une machine à façonner le verre | Examination procedure | 22.09.1986 | Examination requested [1986/47] | 07.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 31.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0004906 (BALL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0062169 (VEBA GLAS AG [DE]); | [A]US4357157 (CARDENAS-FRANCO LUIS, et al); | [A]CH637096 (OWENS ILLINOIS INC [US]) |