EP0140382 - Inking device for a printing machine of the transfer-pad type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.1989 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAMPOflex GmbH Boschstrasse 5 D-71254 Ditzingen / DE | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reinhold, Holger Ludwig-Jahn-Strasse 35/1 D-7290 Freudenstadt / DE | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Vogel, Georg Pat.-Ing. Georg Vogel Hermann-Essig-Strasse 35 D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113127.9 | 31.10.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | DE19830031501U | 03.11.1983 Original published format: DE 8331501 U | [1985/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0140382 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0140382 | Date: | 26.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/20, B41F17/00 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
B41F17/00 (EP,US);
B41F17/003 (EP,US);
B41F31/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Farbgeber für eine Tampondruckmaschine | [1985/19] | English: | Inking device for a printing machine of the transfer-pad type | [1985/30] | French: | Dispositif d'encrage d'une machine d'impression au tampon | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 02.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2388679 (CER SA ETS [FR]); | [Y]GB1313301 (MEAKIN MIDWINTER HOLDINGS LTD); | [A]DE1108131 (HEINRICH ZEIDLER K G MASCHINEN); | [A]GB335041 (HOE & CO R) |