EP0144735 - Method and catalyst for making bisphenol [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willey, Paul Rodman 17 Birch Lane Scotia New York 12302 / US | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18, rue Horace Vernet 92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [2008/43] |
Former [1988/03] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1985/25] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84113206.1 | 02.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | US19830551624 | 14.11.1983 Original published format: US 551624 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0144735 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144735 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/10, C07C149/24, C07C37/20, C08F8/44 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
C07C37/20 (EP,US);
B01J31/10 (EP,US);
C08F8/44 (EP,US);
B01J2231/347 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C37/20, C07C39/16 (US,EP);
C08F8/44, C08F12/08 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Katalysator zur Herstellung von Bisphenol | [1985/25] | English: | Method and catalyst for making bisphenol | [1985/25] | French: | Méthode et catalyseur pour la synthèse de bisphénol | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 07.01.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.04.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.07.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.07.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1767621 [ ]; | DE2931036 [ ] (BAYER AG); | EP0045959 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]); | US4346247 [ ] (FALER GARY R, et al); | US4396728 [ ] (FALER GARY R) |