EP0148355 - Device for separating, turning and putting in order longitudinally and transversely arranged oblong articles leaving a production machine, particularly sweets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otto Hänsel GmbH Lister Damm 19 30163 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states Otto Hänsel GmbH Lister Damm 19 D-30163 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiher, Jörg Wiesenweg 5 D-3054 Rodenberg / DE | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1985/29] | Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Rudolf Bibrach Dipl.-Ing. Elmar Rehberg Postfach 31 62 D-37021 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113241.8 | 03.11.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | DE19833342393 | 24.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342393 | DE19843419039 | 22.05.1984 Original published format: DE 3419039 | [1985/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148355 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148355 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/26 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
B65G47/28 (EP);
B65G47/244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Vereinzeln, Wenden und Einordnen von aus einer Herstellungsmaschine längs- und querliegend austretenden länglichen Warenstücken, insbes. Süsswarenstücken | [1985/29] | English: | Device for separating, turning and putting in order longitudinally and transversely arranged oblong articles leaving a production machine, particularly sweets | [1985/29] | French: | Dispositif de séparation de rotation et de rangement des objets oblongs, notamment bonbons, sortant d'une machine de fabrication en position longitudinale ou transversale | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 10.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 05.11.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR2510977 [ ]; | DE3149307 [ ]; | US3142371 [ ] |