EP0147579 - Protective shell for temperature sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/28] | Protection well for thermosensors | ||
[1987/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.1988 [1988/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL B.V. Rijswijkstraat 175 NL-1062 EV Amsterdam / NL | [1985/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capel, Denis Laan van het Kwekebos 7 NL-7823 KA Emmen / NL | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Rentzsch, Heinz, et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 63008 Offenbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Rentzsch, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Honeywell Holding AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Postfach 10 08 65 D-63008 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113397.8 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | DE19830032493U | 11.11.1983 Original published format: DE 8332493 U | [1985/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0147579 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147579 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/08 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
G01K1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1985/28] | Title | German: | Schutzhülse für Temperaturfühler | [1985/28] | English: | Protective shell for temperature sensors | [1987/37] | French: | Gaines de protection pour capteurs de température | [1985/28] |
Former [1985/28] | Protection well for thermosensors | Examination procedure | 13.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/30] | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US1869151 [ ] (JEFFERY JOSEPH A, et al); | US2707584 [ ] (HOOVER ARTHUR M, et al); | DE1294703 [ ] (CERNY FRANTISEK); | DE3127256 [ ] (KOERTVELYESSY LASZLO) | Examination | US4396792 | US3816183 | DE1928804 |