EP0145932 - A method for visualization of in-plane fluid flow by proton NMR imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1985/26] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wehrli, Felix Werner 2614 East Menlo Boulevard Shorewood Wisconsin 53211 / US | 02 /
MacFall, James Russell 2925 Meadow Lane Hartland Wisconsin 53029 / US | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Voigt, Reinhard, et al Patentanwalt, Pfarrgasse 51 65239 Hochheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Voigt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt, Elsterweg 22 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | ||
Former [1985/26] | Schüler, Horst, Dr. Patentanwalt, Kaiserstrasse 69 D-60329 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113404.2 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | US19830552209 | 15.11.1983 Original published format: US 552209 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145932 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145932 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145932 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N24/08, G01P13/00, G01R33/48 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
G01R33/563 (EP,US);
G01P5/001 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/44] | G01N24/08, G01P13/00, G01R33/20 | ||
Former IPC [1985/26] | G01R33/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/18] |
Former [1985/26] | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sichtbarmachen eines ebenen Flüssigkeitsstroms durch NMR-Abbildung | [1985/26] | English: | A method for visualization of in-plane fluid flow by proton NMR imaging | [1985/26] | French: | Procédé pour l'affichage d'un courant liquide plat par NMR-image | [1985/26] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 31.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/23] | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0126381 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - JOURNAL PHYSICS D: APPLIED PHYSICS, vol. 7, 1974, pages L159-L163, GB; A.N. GARROWAY "Velocity measurements in flowing fluids by MNR" | [A] - JOURNAL PHYSICS E, vol. 11, no. 4, April 1978, pages 281-291, GB; J.R. SINGER "NMR diffusion and flow measurements and an introduction to spin phase graphing" | [AD] - PHYSICAL REVIEW, vol. 94, no. 3, 1st May 1954, pages 630-638, US; H.Y. CARR et al.: "Effects of diffusion on free precession in nuclear magnetic resonance experiments" |