blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0145943

EP0145943 - Improved tar fraction for driveway sealers using oxidized coal tar distillate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.08.1987
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown
New Jersey 07960 / US
[N/P]
Former [1985/26]For all designated states
ALLIED CORPORATION
Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.)
Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Bart, Edward Francis
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / Cook, George Robert
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
03 / Chu, Arthur Shek
c/o Allied Corporation P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
[1985/26]
Representative(s)Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al
Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2
D-80331 München / DE
[1985/26]
Application number, filing date84113544.509.11.1984
[1985/26]
Priority number, dateUS1983055778405.12.1983         Original published format: US 557784
[1985/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0145943
Date:26.06.1985
Language:EN
[1985/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0145943
Date:13.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.1986
ClassificationIPC:C08L95/00, C10C3/04
[1985/26]
CPC:
C08L95/005 (EP,US); C10C3/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1985/26]
TitleGerman:Teerfraktion auf Basis von oxydiertem Kohleteerdestillat für Fahrbahnbindemittel[1985/26]
English:Improved tar fraction for driveway sealers using oxidized coal tar distillate[1985/26]
French:Fraction de goudron améliorée pour liants routiers à base de distillat de goudron de houille oxydé[1985/26]
File destroyed:24.05.1993
Examination procedure13.02.1987Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1987/41]
08.05.1987Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1987/41]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
13.02.1987M02   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.198603   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB775087  (GELSENKIRCHENER BERGWERKS AG);
 [A]GB447861  (TEERVERWERTUNG MIT BESCHRAENKT);
 [A]US4052290  (CUSHMAN DONALD R, et al);
 [A]US3304191  (BARRETT RICHARD C);
 [A]US4139397  (YAN TSOUNG-YUAN)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.