EP0144020 - Azodyes and liquid crystalline materials containing these dyes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Etzbach, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Bensheimer Ring 9a D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Juenemann, Werner, Dr. Haidfeldweg 1c D-6702 Bad Duerkheim / DE | 03 /
Dehnert, Johannes, Dr. Ottweilerstrasse 2 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1985/24] | Application number, filing date | 84113764.9 | 14.11.1984 | [1985/24] | Priority number, date | DE19833342040 | 22.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342040 | [1985/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144020 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144020 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144020 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C09B35/35, C09K19/60 | [1986/47] | CPC: |
C09K19/601 (EP,US);
C09B35/35 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/24] | C09B35/35, C09K19/24 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/24] | Title | German: | Azofarbstoffe und flüssigkristalline Materialien enthaltend diese Farbstoffe | [1985/24] | English: | Azodyes and liquid crystalline materials containing these dyes | [1985/30] | French: | Colorants azoiques et dispositifs à cristaux liquides les contenant | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 04.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0055838 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [X]FR2434891 (BASF AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2627215 |