EP0142172 - Composition usable as adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY International Inc. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York, PA 17405-0872 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | For all designated states DENTSPLY INTERNATIONAL, INC. 570 West College Avenue P.O. Box 872 York Pennsylvania 17405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tateosian, Louis H. 209 Reynolds Mill Road York Pennsylvania 17403 / US | 02 /
Horne, Shek Chee P.O. Box 523 Somers Conn. 06071 / US | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/21] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113781.3 | 14.11.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | US19830552298 | 16.11.1983 Original published format: US 552298 | [1985/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142172 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142172 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/08, C09J3/00, C08F299/06 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
C08F299/06 (EP);
A61K6/75 (EP);
A61K6/76 (EP);
A61K6/77 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/08 (EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/10 (EP);
A61K6/30, C08L33/14 (EP);
A61K6/30, C08L83/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Als Klebstoff anwendbare Zusammensetzung | [1985/32] | English: | Composition usable as adhesive | [1985/21] | French: | Composition utilisable comme adhésif | [1985/32] | File destroyed: | 05.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/09] | 05.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.07.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2345981 [ ] (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | US3909379 [ ] (GOTODA MASAO, et al); | DE2003100 [ ]; | DE1544675 [ ]; | US4274933 [ ] (KAMADA KAZUMASA, et al); | EP0087304 [ ] (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | DE2312559 [ ] (AMALGAMATED DENTAL CO LTD) |