EP0142825 - Silicone rubber as modifier for Poly(Arylene Sulfide) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/22] | Rubbery compounds as modifiers for Poly(Arylene Sulfide) | ||
[1990/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phillips Petroleum Company 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states PHILLIPS PETROLEUM COMPANY 5th and Keeler Bartlesville Oklahoma 74004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beever, William Herbert Route 2 Box 164-B Bartlesville OK 74003 / US | 02 /
Liang, Yeon Fong c/o Wellman Industries Inc. P.O. Box 188 Johnsonville, SC 29555 / US | [1990/14] |
Former [1985/40] | 01 /
Beever, William Herbert Route 2 Box 164-B Bartlesville Oklahoma 74006 / US | ||
02 /
Liang, Yeon Fong c/o Wellman Industries Inc. P.O. Box 188 Johnsonville, SC 29555 / US | |||
Former [1985/22] | 01 /
Beever, William Herbert 5624 S.E. East Pl. Bartlesville Oklahoma 74006 / US | ||
02 /
Liang, Yeon Fong c/o Wellman Industries Inc. P.O. Box 188 Johnsonville, SC 29555 / US | Representative(s) | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dost, Wolfgang, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/22] | Dost, Wolfgang, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84113806.8 | 15.11.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | US19830552884 | 17.11.1983 Original published format: US 552884 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142825 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142825 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142825 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L81/02, C08L83/04 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H01L23/293 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/00 (EP,US);
C08L33/08 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L81/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L81/02, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/22] | C08L81/02, // (C08L81/02, 83:04),(C08L81/02, 23:16),(C08L81/02, 33:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Silikonkautschuk als Modifizierungsmittel für Polyarylensulfide | [1990/14] | English: | Silicone rubber as modifier for Poly(Arylene Sulfide) | [1990/14] | French: | Caoutchouc de silicone comme agent modifiant de poly(sulfures d'arylène) | [1990/14] |
Former [1985/25] | Gummiartige Verbindungen als Modifizierungsmittel für Polyarylensulfide | ||
Former [1985/22] | Rubbery compounds as modifiers for Poly(Arylene Sulfide) | ||
Former [1985/25] | Composés caoutchouteux comme agents modifiants de poly(sulfures d'arylène) | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/14: Teilanmeldung 88120190.9 eingereicht am 15/11/84 | EPB 1990/14: Divisional application 88120190.9 filed on 15/11/84 | EPB 1990/14: Demande divisionnaire 88120190.9 déposée le 15/11/84 | Examination procedure | 30.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/27] | 16.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88120190.9 / EP0316019 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2273044 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0044136 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4395512 (KUBOTA YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) |