EP0144848 - Method for starting a subsynchronous cascade current converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.1989 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BBC Brown Boveri AG Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | [1988/05] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states BBC Aktiengesellschaft Brown, Boveri & Cie. Haselstrasse CH-5401 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zürcher, Urs Viktoriastrasse 44 CH-3013 Bern / CH | [1985/25] | Application number, filing date | 84113960.3 | 19.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | DE19833344808 | 12.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3344808 | [1985/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144848 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144848 | Date: | 04.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144848 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/16, H02K17/34 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
H02P1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anfahren einer untersynchronen Stromrichterkaskade | [1985/25] | English: | Method for starting a subsynchronous cascade current converter | [1985/25] | French: | Procédé pour démarrer un convertisseur de courant sous-synchrone en cascade | [1985/25] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1986 | Examination requested [1986/30] | 28.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 20.07.1988 | FR | 20.07.1988 | SE | 20.11.1988 | [2002/24] |
Former [1989/36] | BE | 20.07.1988 | |
SE | 20.11.1988 | ||
Former [1989/04] | BE | 20.07.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH524277 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]); | [Y]DE1148634 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]CH417756 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) | [X] - BULL.SEV/VSE 65, Heft 2, 26. Januar 1974, Seiten 85-96; H. PISECKER: "Schaltfeste untersynchrone Stromrichterkaskade" |