Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0144848
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] |
19.07.1989 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.1989 [1989/36] |
19.05.1989 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] |
08.12.1988 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.01.1989 [1989/04] |
04.06.1988 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.07.1988 [1988/29] |
15.12.1987 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.02.1988 [1988/05] |
24.04.1987 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.1986 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.07.1986 [1986/30] |
17.04.1986 |
Publication of search report |
published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] |
20.04.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.06.1985 [1985/25] |