EP0144037 - Functional construction element for articles such as playthings, presents or for publicity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1995 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 26.07.1995 [1995/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micklitz, Klaus Königsturmstrasse 21 D-7070 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | [1988/15] |
Former [1985/24] | For all designated states Schleich GmbH & Co. KG Am Limes 73 D-7070 Schwäbisch Gmünd- Herlikofen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/15] |
Former [1985/24] | 01 /
Micklitz, Klaus Königsturmstrasse 21 D-7070 Schwäbisch Gmünd / DE | Representative(s) | Wolf, Eckhard Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | ||
Former [1988/32] | Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1985/24] | Gauger, Hans-Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114021.3 | 20.11.1984 | [1985/24] | Priority number, date | DE19833342718 | 25.11.1983 Original published format: DE 3342718 | [1985/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0144037 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0144037 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0144037 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/04 | [1985/24] | CPC: |
A63H33/102 (EP,US);
Y10T24/309 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45775 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45958 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/24] | Title | German: | Funktionales Formgestaltungselement für Spiele-, Geschenk-oder Werbeartikel | [1985/24] | English: | Functional construction element for articles such as playthings, presents or for publicity | [1985/29] | French: | Elément de constuction fonctionnel pour articles de jeux, cadeaux ou publicité | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 14.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 30.08.1989 | NL | 30.08.1989 | [1995/30] |
Former [1991/12] | BE | 30.08.1989 | |
NL | 30.08.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | NL | 30.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE285367 ; | [AD]US2885822 (ONANIAN RICHARD A); | [A]DE2617098 (TECNOGIOCATTOLI SPA); | [Y]DE2545772 (SCHMIDT OTTO DR [DE]); | [YD]US4170083 (FREELANDER ISRAEL R [US], et al); | [Y]FR2505153 (FLORALUX [FR]) |