blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0182931

EP0182931 - Process for the preparation of very pure magnesium oxide [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.1990
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.1991 [1991/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
[N/P]
Former [1986/23]For all designated states
GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Ainscow, William Stuart
Löwenstrasse 23
CH-8400 Winterthur / CH
02 / Gadgil, Balkrishna Bhaskar
Im Heidenloch 5
CH-8352 Räterschen / CH
[1986/23]
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1986/23]Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE
Application number, filing date84114353.027.11.1984
[1986/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0182931
Date:04.06.1986
Language:DE
[1986/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0182931
Date:28.02.1990
Language:DE
[1990/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.1985
ClassificationIPC:C01F5/02
[1986/23]
CPC:
C01F5/30 (EP,US); C01C1/026 (EP,US); C01F5/06 (EP,US);
C01P2006/80 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1987/49]
Former [1986/23]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Herstellen von hochreinem Magnesiumoxid[1986/23]
English:Process for the preparation of very pure magnesium oxide[1986/23]
French:Procédé de préparation d'oxyde de magnésium ultra-pur[1986/23]
Examination procedure26.11.1985Examination requested  [1986/23]
28.01.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
28.02.1986Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, FR, LU, NL, SE
15.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.12.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.07.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
22.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.1989Fee for grant paid
20.11.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.11.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 05
09.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US1537479  (LORD RICHARD C);
 [A]US1778659  (JOSEPH BLUMENFELD);
 [Y]GB471234  (AMERICAN ZINC LEAD & SMELTING);
 [Y]GB2051759  (SULZER AG)
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 39, Nr. 13, 10. Juli 1945, Spalten 3401-3402-7, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.M. AVERY u.a.: "Modified MgO process yields MgCl2 and CaOCl2" & CHEM. & MET. ENG. 52, No. 4, 94-6
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.