EP0147655 - Miniature squid susceptometer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ketchen, Mark Benjamin 808 Syska Road Ossining New York 10562 / US | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Schröder, Otto Heinrich Albrecht, et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 8803 Rüschlikon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr. Ing., et al IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | ||
Former [1985/28] | Schröder, Otto H., Dr.-Ing. IBM Corporation Säumerstrasse 4 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | Application number, filing date | 84114424.9 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | US19830567302 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567302 | [1985/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147655 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147655 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147655 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/16 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
G01R33/0358 (EP,US);
G01R33/16 (EP,US);
Y10S505/846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/28] | Title | German: | Miniatur-SQUID-Susceptibilitätsmessgerät | [1985/28] | English: | Miniature squid susceptometer | [1985/28] | French: | SQUID-en miniature pour la mesure de susceptibilité | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 14.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 41, no. 7, 1st October 1982, pages 669-671; V.J. DE WAAL et al.: "Compact integrated dc SQUID gradiometer" | [Y] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 40, no. 8, 15th April 1982, pages 736-738; M.B. KETCHEN et al.: "Ultra-low-noise tunnel junction dc SQUID with a tightly coupled planar input coil" | [AD] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 38, no. 9, 1st May 1981, pages 723-725; M.W. CROMAR et al.: "Low-noise tunnel junction dc SQUID's" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 42, no. 4, 15th February 1983, pages 389-391; V.J. DE WAAL et al.: "Low noise niobium dc SQUID with a planar input coil" | [ ] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 42, no. 4, 15th February 1983, pages 389-391; V.J. DE WAAL et al.: "Low noise niobium dc SQUID with a planar input coil" |