EP0147656 - Multi-microprocessor for controlling shared memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/28] | Multi-Microprocessor for controlling shared memory | ||
[1990/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hailpern, Brent Tzion 96 Allison Road Katanah New York 10536 / US | 02 /
Hoevel, Lee Windsor 3167 Poplar Street Yorktown Heights New York 10598 / US | 03 /
Shapiro, Eugene 138 West Haviland Lane Stamford Connecticut 06903 / US | [1985/28] | Representative(s) | Ekström, Gösta IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department 163 92 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Ekström, Gösta E. IBM Svenska AB Intellectual Property Department S-163 92 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 84114426.4 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | US19830567304 | 30.12.1983 Original published format: US 567304 | [1985/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147656 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147656 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147656 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
G06F12/0223 (EP);
G06F13/1663 (EP);
G06F15/8007 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/28] | G06F13/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/28] | Title | German: | Multimikroprozessor aus Steuerung eines gemeinsamen Speichers | [1985/28] | English: | Multi-microprocessor for controlling shared memory | [1990/03] | French: | Multimicroprocesseur pour la commande d'une mémoire commune | [1985/28] |
Former [1985/28] | Multi-Microprocessor for controlling shared memory | Examination procedure | 14.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 20.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4253144 ; | [Y]US4365292 ; | [Y]EP0061585 | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPRING JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, 1972, A.F.I.P.S. Conference Proceedings, vol. 40, pages 431-437, Afips Press, Atlantic City, N.J., US; H.B. BASKIN et al.: "PRIME-a modular architecture for terminal-oriented systems" |