EP0156001 - Process for conditioning contaminated waste by coating with cement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | ||
For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | |||
Former [1985/40] | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | ||
For all designated states KRAFTWERK UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wiesenstrasse 35 D-4330 Mülheim (Ruhr) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mallek, Heinz Bachdresch 15 D-5172 Linnich-Tetz / DE | 02 /
Zange, Egon, Dr. Friedrich-Ebert Platz 22 D-5160 Düren / DE | 03 /
Schlenter, Wolfgang Kleierde 43 D-5166 Kreuzau / DE | 04 /
Trümper, Karl Bleiberg 74 D-5160 Düren-Kufferath / DE | 05 /
Meininger, Siegfried Mühlköppelstrasse 30 D-6472 Altenstadt / DE | 06 /
Bege, Dietmar Schwalbenweg 10 D-8520 Erlangen / DE | [1985/40] | Application number, filing date | 84114497.5 | 29.11.1984 | [1985/40] | Priority number, date | DE19833343422 | 01.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3343422 | [1985/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0156001 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0156001 | Date: | 15.10.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0156001 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/16, G21F9/34 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
G21F9/304 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/40] | G21F9/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Konditionieren kontaminierten Abfalls durch Zementieren | [1985/40] | English: | Process for conditioning contaminated waste by coating with cement | [1985/40] | French: | Procédé pour conditionner les déchets contaminés par enrobage dans le ciment | [1985/40] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/51] | 31.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 15.03.1989 | AT | 29.11.1989 | LU | 30.11.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/29] | NL | 15.03.1989 | |
AT | 29.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/01] | NL | 15.03.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2290745 (ASEA ATOM AB [SE]); | [A]DE2856875 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE); | [A]EP0028670 (KERNFORSCHUNGSZ KARLSRUHE [DE]); | [X]EP0032686 (ALKEM GMBH [DE]) |