EP0143470 - Information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsui, Toshikazu 3-12-10, Minamidai Nakano-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114526.1 | 30.11.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | JP19830224071 | 30.11.1983 Original published format: JP 22407183 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143470 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143470 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B9/08 | [1985/23] | CPC: |
G11B9/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/23] | Title | German: | Informationsaufnahmemedium | [1985/29] | English: | Information recording medium | [1985/23] | French: | Milieu d'enregistrement d'information | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 24.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/36] | 11.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58171737 ; | [A]US4197144 ; | [A]GB2051456 ; | [AP]JPS59171053 ; | [A]US3506971 |