EP0148408 - Process for the production of 2-cycloalkyl-4-methyl-6-hydroxypyrimidine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.1989 [1989/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states Wacker-Chemie GmbH Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 D-81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deinhammer, Wolfgang, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Röntgenstrasse 32 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | 02 /
Schilling, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Schopenhauerweg 10 D-8263 Burghausen / DE | [1985/29] | Application number, filing date | 84114717.6 | 05.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | DE19833344429 | 08.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3344429 | [1985/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148408 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148408 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/36 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
C07D239/36 (EP,US);
C07D239/34 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Isopropyl-4-methyl-6-hydroxy-pyrimidin | [1985/29] | English: | Process for the production of 2-cycloalkyl-4-methyl-6-hydroxypyrimidine | [1985/29] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'isopropyl-2 méthyl-4 hydroxy-6 pyrimidine | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 05.12.1984 | Examination requested [1985/29] | 12.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2065698 [ ] (CHISSO CORP); | US4052397 [ ] (BLACKWELL J THOMAS, et al); | US4052396 [ ] (POCIASK JOSEPH R); | US4163848 [ ] (BLACKWELL JOSEPH T III [US], et al); | DE2853887 [ ] (CONSORTIUM ELEKTROCHEM IND); | GB2083814 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG) |