EP0159401 - Measurement apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.02.1990 [1990/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI ELECTRIC CO. LTD. 1-1, Tanabeshinden, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210 / JP | [1985/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yasuhara, Takeshi 7-20, Kita 4-chome Asagaya Suginami-ku Tokyo ZIP-Code: 166 / JP | 02 /
Nabeta, Eiichi No. 205, Matsuba-Corpo 5-35-9, Honchoh Koganei-shi Tokyo ZIP-Code: 184 / JP | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84114777.0 | 30.07.1982 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | JP19810118412 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841281 | JP19810118413 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841381 | JP19810118414 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841481 | JP19810118415 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841581 | JP19810118416 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841681 | JP19810118417 | 30.07.1981 Original published format: JP 11841781 | JP19810120723 | 03.08.1981 Original published format: JP 12072381 | JP19810120724 | 03.08.1981 Original published format: JP 12072481 | JP19810127336 | 15.08.1981 Original published format: JP 12733681 | JP19810132750 | 26.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13275081 | JP19810134224 | 28.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13422481 | JP19810134225 | 28.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13422581 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159401 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0159401 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, H04B9/00 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
G06F11/1625 (EP,US);
G01D5/248 (EP,US);
G01L9/12 (EP,US);
G01R19/252 (EP,US);
G01R19/255 (EP,US);
G06F11/1608 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1985/44] | Title | German: | Messapparat | [1985/44] | English: | Measurement apparatus | [1985/44] | French: | Appareil de mesure | [1985/44] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/19] | 23.12.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82106917.6 / EP0071912 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3566363 [ ] (DRISCOLL GRAHAM C JR) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 22, no. 8B, January 1980 BALLIET et al. "Module to Module Communication via Fiber-Optic Piping" page 3519 * Fig. 1, 2 * | Examination | DE2925522 | AT291387B | by applicant | DE2925522 | US3566363 | - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198001), vol. 22, no. 8B, page 3519 |