EP0151277 - A disc brake assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.1989 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1989 [1989/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/33] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R (Law Dept.) Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreiner, Peter J. 17021 Deer Path Drive Strongsville, Ohio 44136 / US | 02 /
Bolenbaugh, Daniel L. 19400 Sunnyslope South Bend, Indiana 46614 / US | 03 /
Krebs, David R. 53666 Maplehurst South Bend, Indiana 46637 / US | [1985/33] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Lejet, Christian, et al BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1985/33] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 84115227.5 | 12.12.1984 | [1985/33] | Priority number, date | US19840576512 | 02.02.1984 Original published format: US 576512 | [1985/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0151277 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0151277 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/224, F16D65/20 | [1985/33] | CPC: |
F16D65/18 (EP,US);
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
F16D2121/02 (EP,US);
F16D2121/14 (EP,US);
F16D2123/00 (EP,US);
F16D2125/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/33] | Title | German: | Ein Scheibenbremsenzusammenbau | [1985/33] | English: | A disc brake assembly | [1985/33] | French: | Un assemblage de frein à disque | [1985/33] | Examination procedure | 15.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/12] | 15.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1283254 [ ] (BENDIX CORP [US]); | US4014414 [ ] (YAMAMOTO MAYJUE A, et al); | DE1605978 [ ]; | DE2646631 [ ] |