EP0150396 - Method and apparatus for optically measuring the flow of a fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/32] | For all designated states MTU MOTOREN- UND TURBINEN-UNION MÜNCHEN GMBH Postfach 50 06 40 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Habsburgerstrasse 8 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 02 /
Ding, Kurt, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Leonhardstrasse 4 D-8900 Agsburg / DE | [1985/32] | Application number, filing date | 84115439.6 | 14.12.1984 | [1985/32] | Priority number, date | DE19833347092 | 24.12.1983 Original published format: DE 3347092 | [1985/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0150396 | Date: | 07.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0150396 | Date: | 24.02.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/20, G01F1/704 | [1985/32] | CPC: |
G01P5/20 (EP,US);
G01F1/661 (EP,US);
G01F1/704 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/08] |
Former [1985/32] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Messung der Strömung eines Fluids | [1988/08] | English: | Method and apparatus for optically measuring the flow of a fluid | [1985/32] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la mesure optique d'écoulement d'un fluide | [1985/32] |
Former [1985/32] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur optischen Messung der strömung eines Fluids | Examination procedure | 26.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/37] | 01.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1988
28.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Forschungs- und Versuchsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 5000 Köln 90 / DE Opponent's representative dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1988
28.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Forschungs- und Versuchsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 5000 Köln 90 / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1988
28.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Forschungs- und Versuchsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 5000 Köln 90 / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.06.1988
28.06.1988
ADMISSIBLE Deutsche Forschungs- und Versuchsanstalt für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 5000 Köln 90 / DE Opponent's representative von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | 11.01.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 11.05.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.05.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 29.07.1989 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 10.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 31.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 11.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 26.11.1990 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.01.1991 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 09.02.1991 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1991/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1934583 [ ] (INSTITUTTER FUER PORDUKTUDVIKL); | US3739636 [ ] (VERSACI A, et al); | DE2449358 [ ] (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT); | DE3145987 [ ] (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]) |