EP0148456 - Vibration damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA 1501 Alcoa Building Mellon Square Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA 1501 Alcoa Building Mellon Square Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rawlins, Charles Brodhead 16 Riverside Parkway Massena, N. Y. / US | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115492.5 | 14.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | US19830565179 | 23.12.1983 Original published format: US 565179 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148456 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148456 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148456 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16F7/10, H02G7/14 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
F16F7/108 (EP,US);
H02G7/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, IT, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Schwingungsdämpfer | [1985/29] | English: | Vibration damper | [1985/29] | French: | Amortisseur de vibrations | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 14.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 24.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.07.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.02.1990 | FR | 07.02.1990 | IT | 07.02.1990 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | BE | 07.02.1990 | |
IT | 07.02.1990 | ||
FR | 29.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/26] | BE | 07.02.1990 | |
FR | 29.06.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | BE | 07.02.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4209659 (HAWKINS RONALD G [US]); | [X]US3597522 (KOBAYASHI MASASHI); | [X]US4188502 (GAGNE JEAN-GUY [CA]); | [X]US3939300 (HAWKINS RONALD G); | [A]FR2110649 (APP AUXILI ELECTRIC); | [AD]US3478160 (REED ALUN JOHN) | Examination | - Dubbel, Taschenbuch für den Maschinenbau, S.956 |