EP0148470 - Planar magnetron sputtering with modified field configuration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Shigeru 31-3, Hanegi-1-chome Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Abe, Katsuo 2-12, Take-5-chome Yokosuka-shi / JP | 03 /
Sakata, Masao Fujimiryo, 1545, Yoshidacho Totsuka-ku Yokohama / JP | 04 /
Kasahara, Osamu 8-9, Higashikoigakubo-3-chome Kokubunji-shi / JP | 05 /
Ogishi, Hidetsugu 1018-16, Inumecho Hachioji-shi / JP | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/29] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84115772.0 | 19.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | JP19830239884 | 21.12.1983 Original published format: JP 23988483 | JP19830243843 | 26.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24384383 | JP19830243844 | 26.12.1983 Original published format: JP 24384483 | [1985/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148470 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148470 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148470 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/34 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
H01J37/3429 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
H01J37/3408 (EP,US);
H01J37/3458 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/29] | Title | German: | Planar-Magnetron-Kathodenzerstaubung mit veränderter Feldgestaltung | [1985/29] | English: | Planar magnetron sputtering with modified field configuration | [1985/29] | French: | Pulvérisation cathodique à magnétron planaire à configuration de champ modifiée | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0070574 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]US4391697 (MORRISON JR CHARLES F) | Examination | US4265729 | EP0081176 |